EP1154061 - SUPER WATER-ABSORBENT COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSG International Limited Craigmuir Chambers P.O. Box 71 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Japan Absorbent Technology Institute 3FTakizawa Building, 26-5, Nihonbasi-Hamacho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0007 / JP | ||
For all designated states DSG International Limited Craignuir Chambers P.O. Box 71 Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Japan Absorbent Technology Institute 3FTakizawa Building, 26-5, Nihonbasi-Hamacho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0007 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI CORPORATION 6-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Migaku A-301, Arusu-Kamakura 19-2, Ueki Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247-0073 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Shingo 18-12, Minamiyukigaya 4-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 145-0066 / JP | [2012/44] |
Former [2001/46] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Migaku A-301, Arusu-Kamakura, 19-2, Ueki Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Shingo 18-12, Minamiyukigaya 4-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-0066 / JP | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/48] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/46] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99931448.7 | 19.07.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999JP03875 | Priority number, date | JP19980205280 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20528098 | [2001/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005444 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154061 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154061 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/40, D04H1/64, D04H1/42, D04H13/00, D04H3/12 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
D21H21/22 (EP,US);
D04H1/645 (KR);
A61F13/15642 (EP,US);
D04H1/407 (KR);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (KR);
D04H1/541 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H1/732 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | D04H1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | SUPERABSORBIERENDES HYDROPHILES VERBUNDMATERIAL SOWIE DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/46] | English: | SUPER WATER-ABSORBENT COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | [2001/46] | French: | COMPOSITE SUPER HYDROPHILE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2001 | Translation filed | 19.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | GR | 01.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | IE | 19.07.2013 | LU | 19.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07268752 ; | [A]US4655757 (MCFARLAND TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 3, lines 28-53 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 65 *; | [A]EP0676496 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-30 * page 2, lines 1-53; example 1 *; | [A]EP0783877 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * page 4, lines 11-24 * * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line 3; example 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07268752 A 19951017 (HABITSUKUSU KK) [A] 1-30 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH07268752 (HABITSUKUSU KK); | [Y]JPH07279054 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH0841764 (BASF AG) |