EP1103551 - PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND SALTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EJIMA, Akio, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0081 / JP | 02 /
OHSUKI, Satoru, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0081 / JP | 03 /
OHKI, Hitoshi, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1616-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0081 / JP | 04 /
NAITO, Hiroyuki, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0081 / JP | 05 /
MAKINO, Chie, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0081 / JP | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931515.3 | 23.07.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999JP03962 | Priority number, date | JP19980208807 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20880798 | JP19980274459 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27445998 | [2001/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005230 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103551 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D471/14, C07D498/04, A61K31/505, A61K31/53, A61K31/535 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLDERIVATE UND SALZE DAVON | [2001/22] | English: | PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND SALTS THEREOF | [2001/22] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRAZOLE ET SELS CORRESPONDANTS | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2001 | Translation filed | 23.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/40] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0948776 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); | [XP]WO9832739 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) |