EP1093466 - METHOD FOR PREPARING HYDROXYALKYL STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAIN PROCESSING CORPORATION 1600 Oregon Street Muscatine, Iowa 52761 / US | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIGHTLINGER, Adrian, P. 6 Coventry Lane Muscatine, IA 52761 / US | 02 /
ANTRIM, Richard, L. 3715 170th Street N.E. Solon, IA 52333 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99931858.7 | 23.06.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US14100 | Priority number, date | US19980090313P | 23.06.1998 Original published format: US 90313 P | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9967295 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093466 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08B31/12, C08B31/00 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
C08B31/006 (EP,US);
C08B31/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROXYALKYLSTÄRKE | [2001/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING HYDROXYALKYL STARCH | [2001/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'AMIDON HYDROXYALKYLE | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5747301 ; | [Y]US2802000 (CALDWELL CARLYLE G, et al) [Y] 1,5-12 * column 8, line 5 - line 12; examples IX,,XX *; | [Y]DE1019288 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [Y] 1,5-12 * column 3, line 7 - line 26 *; | [X]US3422088 (TUSCHHOFF JOHN V, et al) [X] 2-4 * column 3, line 4 - line 19 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820702), vol. 6, no. 118, Database accession no. (C - 111), & JP57047301 A 19820318 (SHIKISHIMA BOSEKI KK) [X] 1,5-12 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 17, Database accession no. 33819E | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19821004), vol. 97, no. 14, Database accession no. 111553e, page 86 | [Y] - HARUO ZUZUKI ET AL., "Hydroxyethylation of starches with ethylene oxide", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19641221), vol. 61, no. 13, Database accession no. 16290h, XP002114770 [Y] 1,5-12 * abstract * | [ ] - KOGYO KAGAKU ZASSHI, (1964), vol. 67, no. 6, pages 932 - 935 |