EP1094862 - SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/18] | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND KITS FOR IMPLANTING ARTICLES | ||
[2005/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnerDyne, Inc. 1244 Reamwood Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTH, Michael, J. 15875 Walter Breton Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 02 /
YANG, Mark, C. 255 Mountain View Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041-1111 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/18] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99932071.6 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US14761 | Priority number, date | US19980112102 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: US 112102 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002616 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094862 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094862 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61B17/34 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A61M25/0662 (EP,US);
A61B17/3431 (EP,US);
A61B17/3439 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM IMPLANTIEREN VON ARTIKELN | [2005/03] | English: | SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING ARTICLES | [2005/03] | French: | SYSTEME POUR L'IMPLANTATION D'ARTICLES | [2005/03] |
Former [2001/18] | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND SET ZUM IMPLANTIEREN VON ARTIKELN | ||
Former [2001/18] | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND KITS FOR IMPLANTING ARTICLES | ||
Former [2001/18] | PROCEDES, SYSTEMES ET KITS POUR L'IMPLANTATION D'ARTICLES | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 09.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | NL | 24.08.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2199247 (FEMCARE LTD) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [XD]US5183464 (DUBRUL WILLIAM R [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * column 5, line 54 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5279554 (TURLEY ROGER W [GB]) [A] 8* abstract * | International search | [X]US5183464 (DUBRUL WILLIAM R [US], et al) | by applicant | US4899729 | US5183464 | US5201756 | US5304119 | US5403278 | US5431676 | US5484403 | US5674240 |