EP1101247 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AN INTERCONNECT STRUCTURE FOR AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES, FR | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIK, Mehul 3088 Valleywood Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 02 /
BROYDO, Samuel 26496 Purissima Road Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [2001/27] |
Former [2001/21] | 01 /
NAIK, Mehul 1608 LaRossa Circle San Jose, CA 95125 / US | ||
02 /
BROYDO, Samuel 26496 Purissima Road Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99932210.0 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US15073 | Priority number, date | US19980122080 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: US 122080 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005763 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101247 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101247 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
H01L21/76808 (EP,US);
H01L21/768 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [2006/45] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERBAHNSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG | [2001/21] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING AN INTERCONNECT STRUCTURE FOR AN INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2001/21] | French: | PROCEDE RELATIF A L'ELABORATION D'UNE STRUCTURE D'INTERCONNEXION POUR CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M03   Fee paid on   10.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.11.2006 | CH | 08.11.2006 | LI | 08.11.2006 | NL | 08.11.2006 | [2010/06] |
Former [2009/30] | BE | 08.11.2006 | |
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
ES | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 08.11.2006 | |
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0435187 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * column 19, line 35 - column 20, line 58 * * column 21, line 46 - line 53; figure 8 *; | [XA]WO9710612 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 11, line 36 - page 12, line 4 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 21 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 8; figure 3 * [A] 9-12,15-17; | [A]US5693568 (LIU YOWJUANG W [US], et al) [A] 1-17* column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 51; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5702982 (LEE CHUNG-KUANG [TW], et al) [A] 4,13 * column 5, line 21 - line 67; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0843348 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 18,21 * the whole document * |