EP1049535 - ENCAPSULATED HYDROGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funk, Rüdiger Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 15 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 02 /
Herfert, Norbert Obergasse 59 a 63674 Altenstadt / DE | 03 /
Riegel, Ulrich Steinäckerstrasse 6 60384 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
Weismantel, Matthias Deutelbacher Strasse 2 63637 Jossgrund-Oberndorf / DE | 05 /
Daniel, Thomas 4161 Prindle Court No.204 Chesapeake, VA 23321 / US | 06 /
Engelhardt, Fritz 131 Harbour Watch Drive Chesapeake, VA 23320 / US | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 99932440.3 | 20.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999EP00337 | Priority number, date | DE1998101933 | 20.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801933 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937395 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049535 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1049535 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08F251/00 (EP);
C08F251/02 (EP);
C08L51/00 (EP);
C08L51/02 (EP);
C08J2300/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/02, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTE HYDROGELE | [2000/45] | English: | ENCAPSULATED HYDROGELS | [2000/45] | French: | HYDROGELS ENCAPSULES | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 28.08.2002 | NL | 28.08.2002 | SE | 28.11.2002 | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/05] | FI | 28.08.2002 | |
NL | 28.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 28.08.2002 | |
NL | 28.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 28.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0703265 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-10 * |