EP1100395 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND/OR CREATING A DENTAL PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sutter, Franz Wiedenmattstrasse 12 4435 Niederdorf / CH | [2005/14] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Sutter, Franz Wiedenmattstr. 12 4435 Niederdorf / CH | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Sutter, Franz Bennwilerstrasse 42 4435 Niederdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Eder, Carl E. Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 99932591.3 | 28.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999CH00352 | Priority number, date | CH19980001593 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: CH 159398 | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006042 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100395 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100395 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
A61C8/0066 (EP,US);
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0069 (EP,US);
A61C8/0054 (EP,US);
A61C8/0059 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN UND/ODER BILDEN EINES ZAHNERSATZES | [2001/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND/OR CREATING A DENTAL PROSTHESIS | [2001/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR ET/OU FORMER UNE PROTHESE DENTAIRE | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05000771.5 / EP1522271 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.04.2005 | IE | 06.04.2005 | NL | 06.04.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | CY | 28.07.2005 | LU | 28.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/23] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
IE | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
CY | 28.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
IE | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
IE | 06.04.2005 | ||
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
NL | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.04.2005 | |
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 06.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2693900 (PROSIS SA [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, lines 10-13 * * page 4, lines 22-24 * * page 5, lines 4-11 ** figure 2 *; | [DA]US5310343 (HASEGAWA JIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-11 * column 2, lines 19-26 * * column 2, lines 32-37 * * column 3, lines 6-11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2745998 (PROSIS SA [FR]) [X] 9 * page 2, lines 1-6 * * page 6, lines 12-18 * * figure - *; | [X]WO9802110 (CALLAN DONALD P [US]) [X] 1 * page 13, lines 32-35 * * page 14, lines 13-19 * * page 15, lines 28-31 * * figures 1,3,8 * | by applicant | US5310343 |