EP1095282 - MULTI-POINT PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capres Aps Copenhagen Applied Research, DTU Building 345 st 2800 Lyngby / DK | [2007/38] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Capres Aps Copenhagen Applied Research, DTU Building 345 st 2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSEN, Christian, Leth Frederiksdalsvej 10 E, st. tv. DK-2830 Virum / DK | 02 /
GREY, Francois Boldhusgade 4 DK-1062 Copenhagen K / DK | 03 /
BoGGILD, Peter AEgirsgade 61, 4 sal DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester Søgade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2001/18] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 99932677.0 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999DK00391 | Priority number, date | EP19980610023 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98610023 | DK19370000899 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: DK 37899 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0003252 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095282 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095282 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G01R1/06733 (EP,US);
G01R1/07307 (EP,US);
G01R27/14 (EP,US);
G01R1/06711 (EP,US);
G01R1/06727 (EP);
G01R1/06755 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | MEHRSPITZENFÜHLER | [2001/18] | English: | MULTI-POINT PROBE | [2001/18] | French: | SONDE A PLUSIEURS POINTS | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 25.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2012 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | EP06019447.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 19.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.2008
22.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE SmartTip BV Drienerlolaan 5 7522 NB Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Altenburg, Bernardus Stephanus Franciscus DOGIO Patents BV PO Box 2350 1200 CJ Hilversum / NL | 02
19.06.2008
22.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Octrolix B.V. De Veldmaat 10 7522 NM Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.2008
22.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE SmartTip BV Drienerlolaan 5 7522 NB Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Altenburg, Bernardus Stephanus Franciscus ALTENBURG PATENT Ravelijnstraat 125 4102 AJ Culemborg / NL | ||
02
19.06.2008
22.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE Octrolix B.V. De Veldmaat 10 7522 NM Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Schumann Patent Consultancy B.V., Kerkedennen 43 7621 EB Borne / NL | |||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.2008
SmartTip BV Drienerlolaan 5 7522 NB Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Habets, Winand Altenburg Patent P.O. Box 82 4100 AB Culemborg / NL | ||
02
19.06.2008
Octrolix B.V. De Veldmaat 10 7522 NM Enschede / NL Opponent's representative Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Schumann Patent Consultancy B.V., Kerkedennen 43 7621 EB Borne / NL | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 25.07.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.06.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.05.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 07.05.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/13] | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 14.08.2009 | Appeal received No. T1625/09 | 21.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 05.08.2009 | Appeal received No. T1625/09 | 20.10.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Petition(s) for review: | 07.09.2012 | Petition for review received | Number: R0016/12 | for appeal No. T1625/09-3401 | Petitioner: APPR | 15.11.2013 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | 15.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | BE | 19.09.2007 | CH | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | LI | 19.09.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | ES | 30.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | LU | 08.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | NL | 01.02.2012 | [2014/07] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
LU | 08.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07199219 ; | [X]JPH01147374 ; | [A]EP0466274 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [A] 1,50 * column 1, line 1 - line 27 *; | [Y]US5171992 (CLABES JOACHIM G [US], et al) [Y] 25-49,62-64 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 31 - line 53 * * column 6, line 22 - line 24 * * column 6, line 41 - line 60 *; | [X]DE4301420 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 60,61 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 33 - line 50 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 3 *; | [XD]US5347226 (BACHMANN WALTER A [US], et al) [XD] 1,50 * abstract *; | [XY]US5475318 (MARCUS ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-24,50-59 * column 1, line 5 - line 14; figures 4,5,8B * * column 3, line 6 - line 15 * * column 6, line 25 - line 67 * [Y] 25-49,62-64; | [A]JPH0815318 (YAMAICHI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 8-10 * figure 9 *; | [X]US5557214 (BARNETT C KENNETH [US]) [X] 1,50 * abstract *; | [A]US5613861 (SMITH DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 25,60* abstract *; | [X]DE19648475 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [X] 1,50 * abstract *; | [XP]EP0899538 (IMEC VZW [BE]) [XP] 1,25,50,60 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - line 31 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 30 * * column 10, line 37 - line 48 * * column 12, line 20 - column 13, line 6 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07199219 A 19950804 (MITSUI ENG & SHIPBUILD CO LTD) [X] 1,50 * abstract * | [X] - LEE C ET AL, "HIGH-DENSITY SILICON MICROPROBE ARRAYS FOR LCD PIXEL INSPECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH. ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MICRO ELEC MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INVESTIGATION OF MICRO STRUCTURES, SENSORS, ACTUATORS, MACHINES AND SYSTEMS. SAN DIEGO, FEB. 11 - 15, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960211), no. WORKSHOP 9, pages 429 - 434, XP000689309 [X] 1,50 * abstract * | [X] - SOONIL HONG ET AL, "DESIGN AND FABRICATION OF A MONOLITHIC HIGH-DENSITY PROBE CARD FOR HIGH-FREQUENCY ON-WAFER TESTING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, WASHINGTON, DEC. 3 - 6, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19891203), pages 289 - 292, XP000448223 [X] 1,50 * abstract * * page 289, column R, paragraph 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890908), vol. 013, no. 406, Database accession no. (P - 930), & JP01147374 A 19890609 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,50 * abstract * | [AD] - FUJII T ET AL, "MICROPATTERN MEASUREMENT WITH AN ATOMIC FORCE MICROSCOPE", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, (19910301), vol. 9, no. 2 PART 02, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 666 - 669, XP000222891 [AD] 1-24 * page 667, column R, paragraph 2 - page 668, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.585483 |