EP1092035 - TARGETED INTEGRATION INTO CHROMOSOMES USING RETROVIRAL VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Virologie Teilrechtsfähiges Institut an der Veterinärmedizinischen Universität Wien Veterinärplatz 1 1210 Wien / AT | [2006/09] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Institut für Virologie Teilrechtsfähiges Institut an der Veterinärmedizinischen Universität Wien Veterinärplatz 1 1210 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Austrian Nordic Biotherapeutics AG Veterinärplatz 1 1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNZBURG, Walter Weyprechtgasse 10 A-2340 Mödling / AT | 02 /
SALMONS, Brian Weyprechtgasse 10 A-2340 Mödling / AT | 03 /
STRAUSS-GOLLER, Sabine Hermann-Leopoldi Weg 9 A-1120 Wien / AT | 04 /
KLEIN, Dieter Mollersdorf 33b A-3430 Tulln / AT | [2005/39] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
GÜNZBURG, Walter Weyprechtgasse 10 A A-2340 Mödling / AT | ||
02 /
SALMONS, Brian Mitterfeldstrasse 11 D-85229 Ainhofen / DE | |||
03 /
GOLLER, Sabine Hofmannsthalgasse 6/5/8 A-1030 Wien / AT | |||
04 /
KLEIN, Dieter Mollersdorf 50 A-3430 Tulln / AT | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Schwarz, Albin, Dr. Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2001/16] | Pielken, Petra, Dr. Bavarian Nordic Research Institute GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18 b 82152 Martinsried / DE | Application number, filing date | 99932760.4 | 30.06.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999EP04521 | Priority number, date | DK19980001016 | 01.07.1998 Original published format: DK 101698 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0001835 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092035 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092035 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N5/10, A61K48/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N2740/13043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Extension states | AL | 30.12.2000 | LT | 30.12.2000 | LV | 30.12.2000 | MK | 30.12.2000 | RO | 30.12.2000 | SI | 30.12.2000 | Title | German: | ZIELGERICHTETE INTEGRATION IN CHROMOSOMEN MITTELS RETROVIRALER VEKTOREN | [2001/16] | English: | TARGETED INTEGRATION INTO CHROMOSOMES USING RETROVIRAL VECTORS | [2001/16] | French: | INTEGRATION CIBLEE DANS DES CHROMOSOMES AU MOYEN DE VECTEURS RETROVIRAUX | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 12.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | IT | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | ES | 12.06.2006 | IE | 30.06.2006 | LU | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | BE | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
LU | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | BE | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
IE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | BE | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 12.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9613598 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * page 1 - page 5 *; | [Y]WO9636705 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-23 * page 26, line 1 - page 30, line 35; example 1 *; | [PX]WO9842856 (ENZO THERAPEUTICS INC A FULLY [US]) [PX] 1,3-10,12-23* figures 8-13; examples 10,11 *; | [A] - JOHNSTON K. M. ET AL., "HSV/AAV HYBRID AMPLICON VECTORS EXTEND TRANSGENE EXPRESSION IN IN HUMAN GLIOMA CELLS", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (19970210), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 359 - 370, XP002065885 [A] 1-23 * column W * |