EP1097270 - USE OF PIT EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/13] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADLE, Armin Willbecker Strasse 105 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 02 /
TESMANN, Holger Unter den Linden 23 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | 03 /
BAUMÖLLER, Guido Am Treppchen 5 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
LEONARD, Mark 26 Knoll Road Bexley, Kent DA5 1AZ / GB | 05 /
ROBBE-TOMINE, Laurence 2, avenue Colbert F-77330 Ozoir-la-Ferrière / FR | 06 /
ANSMANN, Achim Kirchberg 25 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 07 /
WACHTER, Rolf Clausthal-Zellerfelder-Strasse 48 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 08 /
HÖRNER, Viola Angerstrasse 49 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 09 /
GRIESBACH, Ute Ludolfstrasse 13 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/37] |
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
WADLE, Armin Willbecker Strasse 105 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | ||
02 /
TESMANN, Holger Unter den Linden 23 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | |||
03 /
BAUMÖLLER, Guido Am Treppchen 5 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | |||
04 /
LEONARD, Mark 26 Knoll Road Bexley, Kent DA5 1AZ / GB | |||
05 /
ROBBE-TOMINE, Laurence 2, avenue Colbert F-77330 Ozoir-la-Ferrière / FR | |||
06 /
ANSMANN, Achim Kirchberg 25 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | |||
07 /
WATCHER, Rolf Clausthal-Zellerfelder-Strasse 48 D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
08 /
HÖRNER, Viola Angerstrasse 49 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
09 /
GRIESBACH, Ute Ludolfstrasse 13 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99932849.5 | 07.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999EP04780 | Priority number, date | GB19980015514 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9815514 | GB19980027616 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9827616 | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004230 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097270 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097270 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/72, D06M13/17, D06M13/144, D06M13/224, A61K7/00, // (D21H17/14, 17:06, 17:24, 17:53) | [2001/19] | CPC: |
D06M13/165 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
D06M13/144 (EP,US);
D06M13/17 (EP,US);
D06M13/224 (EP,US);
D06M13/2243 (EP,US);
D06M15/53 (EP,US);
D21H17/72 (EP,US);
A61Q19/004 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
D06M2200/50 (EP,US);
D21H17/06 (EP,US);
D21H17/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/23] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PIT-EMULSIONEN | [2001/19] | English: | USE OF PIT EMULSIONS | [2001/19] | French: | UTILISATION D'EMULSIONS PIT | [2002/47] |
Former [2001/19] | UTILISATION D'EMULSIONS PIT (TEMPERATURE D'INVERSION DE PHASE) | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9535411 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [YD] 1 * page 14, line 9 - page 15, line 25 * * page 19, line 27 - line 30 *; | [YD]WO9516824 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [YD] 1 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 20; claim 6 *; | [Y]US4112167 (DAKE TIMOTHY WILLIAM, et al) [Y] 1 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 49 *; | [Y]DE19602902 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1 * Beispiele *; | [A]US3896807 (BUCHALTER GILBERT) [A] * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 41 *; | [A]GB2069333 (HASBRO INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]US4786367 (BOGART LARRY [US], et al); | [A]US5240562 (PHAN DEAN V [US], et al) |