EP1095283 - METHOD FOR MEASURING THE FREQUENCY OF A SINUSOIDAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Totalförsvarets Forskningsinstitut 164 90 Stockholm / SE | [2006/02] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT 172 90 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILLERSTRÖM, Gunnar bylundsgatan 36 S-582 36 Linköping / SE | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
HILLERSTRÖM, Gunnar bylundsgatan 36 S-582 36 Linköping / SE | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99933428.7 | 02.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999SE01204 | Priority number, date | SE19980002394 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: SE 9802394 | [2001/18] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002056 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095283 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095283 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/02 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G01R23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN DER FREQUENZ EINES SINUSFÖRMIGEN SIGNALS | [2006/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING THE FREQUENCY OF A SINUSOIDAL SIGNAL | [2001/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA FREQUENCE D'UN SIGNAL SINUSOIDAL | [2001/18] |
Former [2001/18] | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN EINES SINUSFÖRMIGEN SIGNALS | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1999 | Translation filed | 23.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4437057 (SUZUKI SUNAO [JP], et al); | [A]US4928105 (LANGNER PAUL [CA]) |