EP1093377 - INCLUSION OF APOPTOTIC REGULATORS IN SOLUTIONS FOR CELL STORAGE AT LOW TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioLife Solutions, Inc. Science III, Suite 144, Suny Park Binghamton New York 13902-600 / US | [2008/49] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states BioLife Solutions, Inc. Science III, Suite 144, Suny Park Binghamton, New York 13902-600 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUST, John, G. 175 Raish Hill Road Candor, NY 13743 / US | 02 /
VAN BUSKIRK, Robert, G. 1320 W. Glann Road Apalachin, NY 13732 / US | 03 /
BAUST, John, M. 175 Raish Hill Road Candor, NY 13743 / US | 04 /
MATHEW, Aby 22 Edgewood Road Binghamton, NY 13903 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/17] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99933777.7 | 09.07.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US15438 | Priority number, date | US19980092239P | 09.07.1998 Original published format: US 92239 P | US19990283756 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: US 283756 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002572 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093377 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093377 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, A61K35/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | A61K35/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSCHLUSS APOPTOTISCHER REGULATOREN IN LÖSUNGEN ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG VON ZELLEN BEI NIEDRIGTEMPERATUR | [2001/17] | English: | INCLUSION OF APOPTOTIC REGULATORS IN SOLUTIONS FOR CELL STORAGE AT LOW TEMPERATURE | [2001/17] | French: | INCLUSION DE REGULATEURS D'APOPTOSE DANS DES SOLUTIONS DE STOCKAGE DE CELLULES A BASSE TEMPERATURE. | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2008 | 06.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | IE | 09.07.2009 | LU | 09.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/29] | DK | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
LU | 09.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | DK | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | DK | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | DK | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP9322765B ; | [Y]EP0431385 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5* abstract *; | [Y]DE4138040 (PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS VACC [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, line 12 - line 37 *; | [Y]WO9502326 (CRYOMEDICAL SCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5635187 (BATHURST IAN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 14, line 46 - line 55 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 41, Database accession no. 1998-052300, XP002363345 & JP9322765B B2 19971218 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5635187 (BATHURST IAN C [US], et al) |