blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971832

EP0971832 - WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Zimmer, Joachim
Uhlandstrasse 5
77880 Sasbach / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99934208.220.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999DE00113
Priority number, dateDE199810413603.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19804136
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9939947
Date:12.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971832
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60S1/38
[2000/03]
CPC:
B60S1/3801 (EP); B60S2001/3813 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:WISCHBLATT[2000/03]
English:WIPER BLADE[2000/03]
French:LAME D'ESSUIE-GLACE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]GB802388  (CITROEN SA ANDRE) [Y] 6 * page 2, lines 21-40; figure - * [A] 1,4,5;
 [Y]US3060480  (ZIEGLER EUGENE R) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 24; figures 2,4,12 *;
 [XY]US3969784  (JOURNEE PAUL) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 13-25; figures 8-11 * [Y] 5,6;
 [A]EP0756976  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,4-6* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.