EP1094975 - SEAL SECURITY LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEYKAMM, Dieter Adolph von Menzel Strasse 43 D-93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2001/18] | Application number, filing date | 99934580.4 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999EP04683 | Priority number, date | DE1998212169U | 08.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29812169 U | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002792 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094975 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094975 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/06, G09F3/02 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G09F3/0292 (EP);
B65D55/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSSICHERUNGSETIKETT | [2001/18] | English: | SEAL SECURITY LABEL | [2001/18] | French: | ETIQUETTE DE SECURITE POUR FERMETURE INVIOLABLE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB755592 (OTTO JOHANNES BRUUN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 85 - page 2, line 13; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1326090 (BIERBROUWERIJ DE DRIE HOEFIJZE) [A] 1,7* figure 1 *; | [AD]DE9314923U (RICHTER PETER [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 1 *; | [AD]DE29512212U (BRAENZEL ULRICH [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 27 - line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19640193 (HAENDLER & NATERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE9314923U | DE29512212U |