EP1098909 - HYBRID HUMAN/RODENT IGG ANTIBODY TO CD3, AND METHODS OF ITS CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [2011/23] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDMANN, Herman 4 Apsley Road Oxford OX2 7QY / GB | 02 /
FREWIN, Mark 25 White Road Oxford OX4 2JJ / GB | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Dolan, Anthony Patrick, et al BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Dolan, Anthony Patrick, et al BTG International Limited 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Dolan, Anthony Patrick, et al BTG International Ltd., 10 Fleet Place, Limeburner Lane London EC4M 7SB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99934931.9 | 21.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999GB02380 | Priority number, date | GB19980015909 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9815909 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005268 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098909 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098909 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/46, C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, A61K39/395 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | HYBRIDE MENSCH/NAGETIER IGG ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CD3 UND VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/20] | English: | HYBRID HUMAN/RODENT IGG ANTIBODY TO CD3, AND METHODS OF ITS CONSTRUCTION | [2001/20] | French: | ANTICORPS IGG CONTRE CD3 HYBRIDE HUMAIN/RONGEUR ET TECHNIQUES DE CONSTRUCTION | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184932.1 / EP2388275 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9109968 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-43 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9206193 (GORMAN SCOTT DAVID [GB], et al) [DA] 1-43 * example - * * claim - *; | [DA]WO9319196 (BOLT SARAH LOUISE [GB], et al) [DA] 1-43 * example 1 * * claim - *; | [A] - S. BOLT ET AL., "The generation of a humanized, non-mitogenic CD3 monoclonal antibody which retains in vitro immunosuppressive properties.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Weinheim, Germany, (199302), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 403 - 411, XP000561698 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830230216 | [A] - M. CLARK ET AL., "The improved lytic function and in vivo efficacy of monovalent monoclonal CD3 antibodies.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, Weinheim, Germany, (1989), vol. 19, pages 381 - 388, XP000318985 [A] 1-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830190224 | by applicant | EP0018795 | US4361539 | WO9319196 | - Workshops and Conferences, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS | - VAN LLER ET AL., EURO. J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 17, pages 1599 - 1604 | - ALEGRE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 140, page 1184 | - CHATENAUD ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1991), vol. 51, page 334 | - NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1985), vol. 313, page 339 | - CLARK ET AL., EUROPEAN J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 19, pages 381 - 388 |