EP1100953 - CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PREPARING OPTICALLY PURE ($i(S))-3-HYDROXY-GAMA-BUTYROLACTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Fine Chemicals Co., Ltd. 190, Yeoncheong-dong, Nam-ku, Ulsan Keongsangnam-do 680-090 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Samsung Fine Chemicals Co., Ltd. 190, Yeoncheong-dong, Nam-ku, Ulsan Keongsangnam-do 680-090 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUN, JongPil 514-1405 Chungsol Apt., Songgang-dong Yusung-ku, Daejeon 305-503 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Yik-Haeng 103-205 Parangsae Apt., Dunsan-dong Seo-ku, Daejeon 302-120 / KR | 03 /
ROH, KyoungRok 105-1007 Sejong Apt., Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku, Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 04 /
PARK, YoungMi 513-1401 Chungsol Apt., Songgang-dong Yusung-ku, Daejeon 305-503 / KR | 05 /
YU, HoSung 109-406 Sejong Apt., Jeonmin-dong Yusung-ku, Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 06 /
HWANG, DaeIl 513-1410 Chungsol Apt., Songgang-dong Yusung-ku, Daejeon 305-503 / KR | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99935130.7 | 23.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999KR00398 | Priority number, date | KR19290091298 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: KR 2991298 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005401 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100953 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100953 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12P41/00, C07C51/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C07D307/33 (EP,US);
C12P17/04 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US);
C12P19/22 (EP,US);
C12P7/42 (EP,US);
H04M1/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/41] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kontinuierliches Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch reinem (S)-3-Hydroxy-gamma-Butyrolacton | [2001/21] | English: | CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PREPARING OPTICALLY PURE ($i(S))-3-HYDROXY-GAMA-BUTYROLACTONE | [2001/21] | French: | PROCEDE EN CONTINU DE PREPARATION DE ($i(S))-3-HYDROXY-GAMMA-BUTYROLACTONE OPTIQUEMENT PURE | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 23.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9804543 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al); | [A]EP0513430 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]); | [A]US5808107 (HOLLINGSWORTH RAWLE I [US]); | [A]JPH06172256 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 18, no. 511, & JP06172256 A 19940927 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM IND CO LTD) |