EP1100464 - LIPID EMULSION AND SOLID LIPID NANOPARTICLE AS A GENE OR DRUG CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Science and Technology 39-1 Hawollkog-dong, Sungbuk-ku Seoul 136-791 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states KOREA INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 39-1 Hawollkog-dong, Sungbuk-ku Seoul 136-791 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Seo Young 5, Munchonmaeul Life Apt. 205/501, Juyeop 2-Dong Ilsan-Ku, Koyang, Kyungki-Do 411-372 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Ick Chan 274, Shiyoung Apt. 706-704, Hakye- Dong Nowon-Ku, Seoul 130-230 / KR | 03 /
CHUNG, Hesson Jukong Apt. 201-1005, Mansoo-Dong Namdong-Ku, Inchon 405-240 / KR | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935145.5 | 30.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999KR00414 | Priority number, date | KR19980031249 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: KR 9831249 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006120 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100464 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
A61K48/00 (EP);
A61K9/10 (KR);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/5123 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPIDEMULSION UND FESTE LIPIDNANOTEILCHEN ALS GEN- ODER WIRKSTOFFCARRIER | [2001/21] | English: | LIPID EMULSION AND SOLID LIPID NANOPARTICLE AS A GENE OR DRUG CARRIER | [2001/21] | French: | EMULSION LIPIDIQUE ET NANOPARTICULE LIPIDIQUE SOLIDE EN TANT QUE TRANSPORTEURS DE GENES OU DE MEDICAMENTS | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9625917 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]); | [X]WO9300160 (UNIV EMORY [US]); | [X]EP0490053 (WELLA AG [DE]); | [X]JPH0344314 ; | [X]JPH06219940 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910509), vol. 015, no. 181, Database accession no. (C - 0830), & JP03044314 A 19910226 (NIPPON PETROCHEM CO LTD) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941110), vol. 018, no. 588, Database accession no. (C - 1271), & JP06219940 A 19940809 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) |