EP1102912 - A METHOD OF EXTENDING THE LENGTH OF A DRILL STRING, A DRILL STRING ELEMENT AND A COUPLING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Aktiebolag (publ) 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMAN, Pieter 105 Wilde Amandel Street 1724 Roodepoort / ZA | [2001/22] | Application number, filing date | 99935219.8 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999SE01160 | Priority number, date | ZA19980005985 | 07.07.1998 Original published format: ZA 9805985 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001919 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102912 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/04 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
E21B17/00 (EP,US);
E21B17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | IE, SE [2001/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERLÄNGERN EINES BOHRSTRANGS IM BOHRELEMENT UND IM VERBINDUNGSELEMENT | [2001/22] | English: | A METHOD OF EXTENDING THE LENGTH OF A DRILL STRING, A DRILL STRING ELEMENT AND A COUPLING MEMBER | [2001/22] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTENSION DE LA LONGUEUR D'UN TRAIN DE TIGES, ELEMENT DE TRAIN DE TIGES ET ELEMENT DE COUPLAGE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/14] | 29.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2788234 (DOYLE CEDRIC J); | [Y]SE339452 (SANDVIKENS JERNVERKS AB [SE]); | [X]US4454922 (JAMISON WILL B [US], et al); | [A]US4632195 (EMMERICH KENNETH C [US]) |