EP1090500 - TERMINAL POWERED ON FOR EPG DOWNLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Index System, Inc. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard 12th Floor Los Angeles CA 90028 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Index System, Inc. P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Index Systems, Inc. P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers, Road Town Tortola, British Virgin Islands / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACRAE, Douglas, B. 23 Cart Path Road Weston, MA 02493 / US | 02 /
O'CONNOR, Daniel, C. 41 Hathaway Avenue Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935353.5 | 26.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US14401 | Priority number, date | US19980090805P | 26.06.1998 Original published format: US 90805 P | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001141 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090500 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090500 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04N7/088 (EP);
H04H20/40 (EP);
H04H40/09 (EP);
H04H60/72 (EP);
H04N21/42692 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTSCHALTUNG ZUM HERUNTERLADEN ELEKTRONISCHER PROGRAMMFÜHRER | [2006/21] | English: | TERMINAL POWERED ON FOR EPG DOWNLOAD | [2001/15] | French: | TERMINAL MIS SOUS TENSION EN VUE DU TELECHARGEMENT D'UN GUIDE ELECTRONIQUE DES PROGRAMMES | [2001/15] |
Former [2001/15] | ENDGERÄTSCHALTUNG ZUM GERNLADEN ELEKTRONISCHER PROGRAMMFÜHRUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | IE | 26.06.2007 | LU | 26.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/25] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
IE | 26.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0895415 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract ** claims 1-4 * | International search | [A]US5592551 (LETT DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]US5657072 (ARISTIDES PHIVOS C [US], et al); | [XP]US5850218 (LAJOIE MIKE L [US], et al) |