EP1097116 - ASYMMETRIC METATHESIS REACTIONS INVOLVING ACHIRAL AND MESO SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROCK, Richard, R. 15 Cabot Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 02 /
HOVEYDA, Amir, H. 20 Preble Gardens Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935533.2 | 13.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999US15816 | Priority number, date | US19980114692 | 13.07.1998 Original published format: US 114692 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002834 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097116 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07B53/00, C07B57/00, C07F7/18, C07D307/28, C07D309/18, C07F11/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07B57/00 (EP,US);
C07F11/005 (EP,US);
C07F7/1892 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US);
Y10S585/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | ASYMETRISCHE METATHESEREAKTIONEN MIT ACHIRALEN- UND MESOSUBSTRATEN | [2001/19] | English: | ASYMMETRIC METATHESIS REACTIONS INVOLVING ACHIRAL AND MESO SUBSTRATES | [2001/19] | French: | REACTIONS DE METATHESE ASYMETRIQUE FAISANT INTERVENIR DES SUBSTRATS ACHIRAUX ET MESO | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 04.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/49] | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/49] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9942469 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [E] 77-79,84-86 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - O. FUJIMURA, "Asymmetric ring-closing metathesis catalyzed by chiral molybdenum alkylidene complexes", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (19980206), vol. 63, no. 3, pages 824 - 832, XP002102158 [X] 1-7,12-14,34,56-60,74-76 * page 826, column 1; page 828, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo971952z | [X] - J. B. ALEXANDER, "Catalytic enantioselective ring-closing metathesis by a chiral biphen-Mo complex", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (19980429), vol. 120, no. 16, pages 4041 - 4042, XP002102157 [X] 77-79,84-86 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja974353i | [X] - O. FUJIMURA, "Asymmetric ring-closing metathesis: kinetic resolution catalyzed by a chiral molybdenum alkylidene complex", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (1996), vol. 118, no. 10, pages 2499 - 2500, XP002102152 [X] 77-79,84 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9531384 | [X] - L. E. MARTINEZ, "Highly enantioselective ring opening of epoxides catalyzed by (salen)Cr(III) complexes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (19950531), vol. 117, no. 21, pages 5897 - 5898, XP000569876 [X] 61,62,67-72 * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00126a048 | [PX] - D. S. LA, "Mo-catalyzed asymmetric synthesis of dihydrofurans. Catalytic kinetic resolution and enantioselective desymmetrization through ring-closing metathesis", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DC US, (19980923), vol. 120, no. 37, pages 9720 - 9721, XP002102156 [PX] 1-10,15-20,34,40-45,56-65,67-72,74-79,84-86 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9821089 |