EP1116095 - PRINTING METHOD AND APPARATUS HAVING MULTIPLE RASTER IMAGE PROCESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics for Imaging, Inc. 303 Velocity Way Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Electronics for Imaging 303 Velocity Way Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTAMED, Margaret 410 Nantucket Street Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
SEGAL, Alon 35 Aladdin Terrace San Francisco, CA 94133 / US | 03 /
KONG, Chew, Yan 707 Continental Circle, 221 Mountain View, CA / US | 04 /
GUNTURU, Ravindranath 36857 C Newark Boulevard Newark, CA 94560 / US | 05 /
DZIESIETNIK, Ghilad 4097 Laguna Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99935626.4 | 15.07.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US16112 | Priority number, date | US19980098125P | 27.08.1998 Original published format: US 98125 P | US19990298639 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 298639 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013079 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116095 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116095 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/1211 (EP);
G06F3/124 (EP);
G06F3/1288 (EP);
G06K15/1857 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKVERFAHREN UND GERÄT, DAS MEHRERE RASTERBILDPROZESSOREN HAT | [2001/29] | English: | PRINTING METHOD AND APPARATUS HAVING MULTIPLE RASTER IMAGE PROCESSORS | [2001/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'IMPRESSION DOTE DE PROCESSEURS D'IMAGES TRAMES MULTIPLES | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0545261 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,13,15,16,21,23,25,27 * figures 2-4 * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 53 *; | [A]EP0578258 (MICROSOFT CORP) [A] 1,2,4-7,9,10,13,14,16-18,20,21,23-25,27 * figure 3 * * column 11, line 3 - column 30, line 1 *; | [A]WO9601449 (LASERMASTER CORP) [A] 23,25 * figures 4-9 * * page 8, line 13 - page 16, line 7 * |