EP1115280 - PEST CONTROL TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences, LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBER, Daniel, T. 6109 Colony Mill Lane Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US | 02 /
ARNOLDY, Anton 8040 Ridgewind Circle Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | 03 /
GORGACZ, Stanley, Michael 847 Mountain Ash Court Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 04 /
KING, James, Edward 12830 Fleetwood South Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 05 /
ROBERTSON, A., Sterett 11967 West County Road 400 North Thorntown, IN 46071 / US | 06 /
TROMPEN, Mick, A. 1923 Emerald Pines Lane Westfield, IN 46074 / US | 07 /
WARREN, Malcolm 1811 Eastlawn Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | 08 /
WUJEK, Dennis 9970 Oak Ridge Drive Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Roberts, Peter David, et al Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935793.2 | 21.07.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US16519 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106851 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115280 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1115280 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01M31/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,US);
H05C3/00 (KR);
A01M1/026 (EP,US);
A01M1/24 (EP,US);
A01M31/002 (EP,US);
A01M2200/011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSVERFAHREN | [2001/29] | English: | PEST CONTROL TECHNIQUES | [2001/29] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE LUTTE CONTRE LES PARASITES | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 26.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04078064.5 / EP1506710 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2005 | BE | 09.03.2005 | CH | 09.03.2005 | FI | 09.03.2005 | LI | 09.03.2005 | NL | 09.03.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | DE | 10.06.2005 | CY | 21.07.2005 | GB | 21.07.2005 | IE | 21.07.2005 | LU | 21.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
GB | 21.07.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
GB | 21.07.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
GB | 21.07.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
DE | 10.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
NL | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
CH | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
LI | 09.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.03.2005 | |
BE | 09.03.2005 | ||
FI | 09.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0283142 (RENTOKIL LTD [GB]) [X] 50-52,55-58,62 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 22 - line 27 * * column 6, line 25 - line 46 * * column 7, line 22 - line 30 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,8,16,29,37,41-44,46,47,53; | [XA]US5571967 (TANAKA KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 36,40 * column 7, line 27 - line 40 * * figures 1,15 * [A] 48,54,64; | [XDA]US5815090 (SU NAN-YAO [US]) [XD] 43,49,56-58,66,67 * column 2, line 52 - line 55 * * column 3, line 10 - line 13 * * column 3, line 1 - line 3 * * column 3, line 45 - line 52 * * column 4, line 9 - line 25 * * column 3, line 62 - line 64 * * column 7, line 25 - line 35 * * figures 1,3-7 * [A] 1,8,16,29,36,37,42,44,50,63; | [DA]WO9846071 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [DA] 16* page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 25 * | by applicant | US5764138 | US5815090 |