EP1062312 - FABRIC CONDITIONING CONCENTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2000/52] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAMMADI, Mansur S., Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside L63 3JW / GB | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Elliott, Peter William Unilever plc Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99936088.6 | 26.01.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999EP00497 | Priority number, date | GB19980004283 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9804283 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943777 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062312 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062312 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D3/22, C11D1/835 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/50 (EP);
C11D17/0026 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
C11D3/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/52] | Title | German: | WÄSCHEKONDITIONIERUNGSKONZENTRAT | [2000/52] | English: | FABRIC CONDITIONING CONCENTRATE | [2000/52] | French: | CONCENTRE DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR TISSUS | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 22.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0813862 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1,9-12,18 * page 4, line 18 - line 22; example -; claims 1,1 *; | [DAP]EP0829531 (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [DAP] 1,6-11,18 * example -; claims 1-18 *; | [A]US5429754 (LIN SAMUEL Q ET AL) [A] 1 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 11; claim 1 *; | [A]US5246611 (TRINH TOAN) [A] 1-3 * examples 22,32; claim - * |