Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1062368
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.01.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
10.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
05.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|