EP1062368 - PROTEIN INTERACTION AND TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA Room 331, IRC Building, 2194 Health Sciences Mall Vancouver British Columbia, V6T 1Z3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA Room 331, IRC Building, 2194 Health Sciences Mall Vancouver, British Columbia, V6T 1Z3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONG, Christopher, J. 101 - 688 West 12th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1M8 / CA | 02 /
JIRIK, Frank, R. 103 - 146 West 13th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Y 1V7 / CA | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99936098.5 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999CA00173 | Priority number, date | CA19982224475 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: CA 2224475 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943848 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062368 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C12N15/85, C12N15/62 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/1055 (EP);
C12N15/625 (EP);
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12Q1/6897 (EP);
C07K2319/61 (EP);
C07K2319/71 (EP);
C07K2319/81 (EP);
C12N2800/40 (EP);
C12N2800/60 (EP);
C12N2840/44 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6897, C12Q2565/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | PROTEIN INTERAKTIONS UND TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTOR FALLE | [2000/52] | English: | PROTEIN INTERACTION AND TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR TRAP | [2000/52] | French: | DETECTION DE L'INTERACTION DE PROTEINES ET PIEGEAGE DU FACTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9730164 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL ;HASELOFF JAMES PHILLIP (GB); HODGE SARAH (GB)) [A] 16,17 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9526400 (ONYX PHARMA INC); | [DA]WO9416092 (JARVIK JONATHAN WALLACE) | [DX] - FIELDS S ET AL, "A NOVEL GENETIC SYSTEM TO DETECT PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS", NATURE, (19890720), vol. 340, page 245/246, XP002914166 [DX] 18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/340245a0 | [DA] - SKARNES W C, "THE IDENTIFICATION OF NEW GENES: GENE TRAPPING IN TRANSGENIC MICE", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (19930101), vol. 4, pages 684 - 689, XP000569473 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(93)90050-7 |