EP1058828 - SYSTEM FOR THE IN-LINE EXTRACTION AND DILUTION OF A REPRESENTATIVE SAMPLE OF A PROCESSED MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Honeywell Inc. Honeywell Plaza MN12-8251 P.O. Box 524 Minneapolis Minnesota 55440-0524 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREUD, Paul, J. 3113 Cloverly Drive Furlong, PA 18925 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99936115.7 | 23.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US03832 | Priority number, date | US19980030463 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: US 30463 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944034 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058828 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/38 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR IN-LINE EXTRAKTION UND VERDÜNNUNG EINER REPRÄSENTATIVEN PROBE EINES BEARBEITETEN STOFFES | [2000/50] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE IN-LINE EXTRACTION AND DILUTION OF A REPRESENTATIVE SAMPLE OF A PROCESSED MEDIUM | [2000/50] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXTRACTION ET DE DILUTION EN LIGNE D'UN ECHANTILLON REPRESENTATIF D'UN MILIEU TRAITE | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5410907 (STROEM HANS [SE], et al) [A] 1,7,11 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 33; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5332512 (WELLS DAVID [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 1, lines 10-23 * * column 2, lines 5-38; figure 2 *; | [A]US3791196 (LEPPER J) [A] 1,7,11 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]EP0550045 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 3, lines 1-30 * * column 6, line 29 - column 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US4633706 (ITO SEITOKU [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,11 * column 3, lines 14-36; figure 1 * |