EP1027608 - PROTEIN FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odyssey Thera, Inc. 4550 Norris Canyon Road, Suite 140 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2010/03] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Odyssey Thera, Inc. 4550 Norris Canyon Road, Suite 140 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTREAL 6128, Succursale A Montréal, Québec H3C 3J7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHNICK, Stephen, William, Watson 330 Grosvenor Westmount, Quebec H3C 2M2 / CA | 02 /
PELLETIER, Joelle, Nina Apartment 611, 10 Rosemount Avenue Westmount, Quebec H3Y 3K4 / CA | 03 /
REMY, Ingrid 8526 Berri Montreal, Quebec H2P 2G4 / CA | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99936199.1 | 30.07.1999 | [2000/33] | WO1999CA00702 | Priority number, date | CA19982244349 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: CA 2244349 | US19980124850 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: US 124850 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0007038 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1027608 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027608 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/566, G01N33/68 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/566 (EP);
C12N15/1055 (EP);
G01N33/581 (EP);
G01N33/68 (EP);
G01N2500/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | EIWEISBRUCHSTÜCKERGÄNZUNGSTESTS | [2000/33] | English: | PROTEIN FRAGMENT COMPLEMENTATION ASSAYS | [2000/33] | French: | DOSAGES DE COMPLEMENTATION DE FRAGMENTS PROTEIQUES | [2009/28] |
Former [2000/33] | DOSAGES DE COMPLEMENTATION PROTEINES-FRAGMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 | 07.06.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | AT | 30.07.2010 | FI | 30.07.2010 | SE | 31.07.2010 | [2014/33] |
Former [2014/24] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 30.07.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
SE | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 30.07.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
SE | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 30.07.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
GB | 30.07.2010 | ||
SE | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 30.07.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
GB | 30.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
SE | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
AT | 30.07.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
GB | 30.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
GB | 30.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
FI | 30.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | PT | 20.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9844350 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR) [PX] 1-66 * claim - * * page 5, line 4 - line 17 * * page 13, line 3 - line 12 * * page 15, line 10 - line 30 * * page 19, line 5 - line 27 * * page 27, line 7 - line 28 * * example 11 *; | [PX]WO9834120 (PELLETIER JOELLE NINA ;REMY INGRID (CA); UNIV MONTREAL (CA); MICHN) [PX] 1-66 * the whole document *; | [XY] - PELLETIER J N ET AL, "A PROTEIN COMPLEMENTATION ASSAY FOR DETECTION OF PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS IN VIVO", PROTEIN ENGINEERING,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, vol. 10, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0269-2139, page 89, XP002064563 [X] 1-66 * the whole document * [Y] 1-66 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/10.1.89 | [YD] - ROSSI F ET AL, "MONITORING PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS IN INTACT EUKARYOTIC CELLS BY BETA-GALACTOSIDASE COMPLEMENTATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, page 8405-8410, XP002064565 [YD] 1-66 * page 8410 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.16.8405 | Examination | - WATOWICH ET AL, "Activation and inhibition of EpoR function:Role of receptor dimerization", MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 14, pages 3535 - 3549 | - MIURA ET AL, "Inactivation of EpoRfunction by point mutations in a region having homology with other cytokine receptors", MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 13, pages 1788 - 1795 | - QUELLE ET AL, "Mutations in the WSAWSE and cytosolic domains of the EpoR affect signal transduction and ligand binding and interalization.", MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 12, pages 4553 - 4561 |