EP1102582 - INHIBITORS OF TYPE 3 3ALPHA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDORECHERCHE INC. 2989 de la Promenade Sainte-Foy Quebec G1W 2J5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Endorecherche Inc. 2989 de la Promenade Sainte-Foy, Quebec G1W 2J5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABRIE, Fernand 2989 de la Promenade Ste-Foy, Québec G1W 2J5 / CA | 02 /
MERAND, Yves 3101 Montreux Sainte-Foy, Québec G1W 3A1 / CA | 03 /
GAUTHIER, Sylvain 152, rue de la Modiste Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures, Québec G3A / CA | 04 /
PROVENCHER, Louis 7518 de la Sarcelle Charny, Québec G6X 3R7 / CA | 05 /
LUU-THE, Van 4460 de l'Estuaire Charny, Québec G6X 1C6 / CA | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Larfeldt, Helene, et al Bergensträhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Larfeldt, Helene, et al Bergensträhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99936218.9 | 06.08.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999CA00724 | Priority number, date | US19980095623P | 07.08.1998 Original published format: US 95623 P | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0007576 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102582 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/565, A61K31/566, A61K31/567, A61K31/585, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P17/10, A61P17/08, A61P17/14, A61P5/26 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C07J21/00 (EP);
A61K31/566 (EP);
A61K31/5685 (EP);
A61K31/585 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/26 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/566, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5685, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TYP 3 3ALPHA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE HEMMER | [2001/22] | English: | INHIBITORS OF TYPE 3 3ALPHA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE | [2001/22] | French: | INHIBITION DE LA 3$G(a)-HYDROXYSTEROID-DESHYDROGENASE DE TYPE 3 | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 11.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9946279 (ENDORECHERCHE INC [CA]) [E] 1-19,22-25,27-79 * abstract * * claims 19-25,32,36,58-63,71,93-98,106,114-204 *; | [X]US3562260 (RUGGIERI PIETRO DE, et al) [X] 1-3,9,11-13,16-19,21-25,27-79 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 12; examples 8-16; claim - *; | [X]EP0117117 (LIEHR JOACHIM GEORG) [X] 16,18,19,22,24,25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9504535 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 16,18,19,22,24,25 * abstract * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 2; example 4; table 1 * * claims 1,14,15 *; | [X]US4340602 (BROOKS SAMUEL C) [X] 16,22 * the whole document *; | [X]US4568673 (BROOKS SAMUEL C [US], et al) [X] 16,22 * the whole document *; | [X] - PAGE, PHILIP C. BULMAN ET AL, "Efficient regioselective A-ring functionalization of estrogens", TETRAHEDRON (1990), 46(6), 2059-68, XP000867284 [X] 22,24,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)89772-6 | [A] - DUFORT, ISABELLE ET AL, "Molecular cloning of human type 3 3.alpha.-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase that differs from 20.alpha.-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase by seven amino acids", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN. (1996), 228(2), 474-479, XP000867346 [A] 14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.1684 | [A] - LUU-THE V ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF HUMAN TYPES 1, 2 AND 3 17BETA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE ACTIVITIES: OXIDATION/REDUCTION AND INHIBITION", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY,GB,ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., OXFORD, vol. 55, no. 5/06, ISSN 0960-0760, page 581-587, XP000196678 [A] 1-19,22-25,27-79 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-0760(95)00209-X |