blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1082791

EP1082791 - COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH FOR INSTALLATION IN AN ENCAPSULATION MODULE OF A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR AND ENCAPSULATION MODULE COMPRISING A COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/11]ENCAPSULATION MODULE WITH A COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH FOR A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR
[2004/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
17.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DAMBIETZ, Hans-Peter
Gliensteig 1
D-13589 Berlin / DE
02 / MEINHERZ, Manfred
Forststrasse 45
D-13467 Berlin / DE
03 / SUHR, Michael
Ragazer Strasse 14
D-13407 Berlin / DE
 [2001/11]
Application number, filing date99936341.925.05.1999
[2001/11]
WO1999DE01571
Priority number, dateDE199812538628.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19825386
[2001/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9962154
Date:02.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1082791
Date:14.03.2001
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1082791
Date:13.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H02B13/035
[2001/11]
CPC:
H02B13/035 (EP); H01H31/003 (EP); H01H1/38 (EP);
H01H3/46 (EP); H01H31/32 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [2001/11]
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTER TRENN-ERDUNGSSCHALTER ZUM EINBAU IN EINEN KAPSELUNGSBAUSTEIN EINER GASISOLIERTEN SCHALTANLAGE UND KAPSELUNGSBAUSTEIN MIT EINEM EINGEBAUTEN KOMBINIERTEN TRENN-ERDUNGS-SCHALTER[2004/42]
English:COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH FOR INSTALLATION IN AN ENCAPSULATION MODULE OF A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR AND ENCAPSULATION MODULE COMPRISING A COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH[2004/42]
French:COMMUTATEUR COMBINE DE SEPARATION ET DE MISE A LA TERRE POUR L'INSTALLATION DANS UNE MODULE D'ENCAPSULATION POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE COMMUTATION ISOLEE PAR GAZ ET MODULE D'ENCAPSULATION COMPORTANT UN COMMUTATEUR COMBINE DE SEPARATION ET DE MISE A LA TERRE[2004/42]
Former [2001/11]KAPSELUNGSBAUSTEIN MIT EINEM KOMBINIERTEN TRENN-ERDUNGS-SCHALTER FÜR EINE GASISOLIERTE SCHALTANLAGE
Former [2001/11]ENCAPSULATION MODULE WITH A COMBINED DISCONNECTING-EARTHING SWITCH FOR A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR
Former [2001/11]MODULE D'ENCAPSULATION COMPORTANT UN COMMUTATEUR COMBINE DE SEPARATION ET DE MISE A LA TERRE POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE COMMUTATION ISOLEE PAR GAZ
Entry into regional phase22.11.2000National basic fee paid 
22.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/11]
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2005Fee for grant paid
07.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL13.04.2005
[2006/14]
Cited inInternational search[A]US5134542  (SUZUYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 29 *
ExaminationDE19511168
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.