EP1098781 - REINFORCED RADIAL TYRE BEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUXERRE, Pascal 11, chemin de la Pauze F-63130 Royat / FR | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Diernaz, Christian Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Diernaz, Christian Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99936515.8 | 12.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP04877 | Priority number, date | FR19980009451 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809451 | [2001/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005085 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098781 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098781 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/06 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B60C15/06 (EP,US);
B60C15/00 (KR);
B60C15/0607 (EP,US);
B60C2015/009 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/36] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE RADIALREIFENWULST | [2001/20] | English: | REINFORCED RADIAL TYRE BEAD | [2001/20] | French: | BOURRELET RENFORCE DE PNEUMATIQUE RADIAL | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 16.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2356528 (PIRELLI [IT]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 5 - line 11 * * page 5; claim - *; | [A]FR2435359 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 3,7; claim - * | by applicant | FR19650003570 |