EP1104421 - 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDINE-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B PYRIDINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/23] | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDINE-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B]PYRIDINE | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUB, Alexander Moospfad 30 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
FEURER, Achim Schlinghofenerstrasse 36 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
FÜRSTNER, Chantal Arnoldstrasse 33 D-45478 Mülheim / DE | 04 /
ALONSO-ALIJA, Cristina Feuerbachstrasse 7 D-42781 Haan / DE | 05 /
STASCH, Johannes-Peter Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 109 D-42651 Solingen / DE | 06 /
PERZBORN, Elisabeth Am Tescher Busch 13 D-42327 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
HÜTTER, Joachim Teschensudbergerstrasse 13 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
DEMBOWSKY, Klaus Ziegeläckerweg 10 D-69198 Schriesheim / DE | 09 /
STAHL, Elke Reuterstrasse 124 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2001/23] | Application number, filing date | 99936550.5 | 16.07.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999EP05071 | Priority number, date | DE1998134045 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834045 | [2001/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006567 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104421 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, // (C07D471/04, 231:00), C07D221:00 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/23] | Title | German: | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDIN-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUORBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B PYRIDIN | [2007/46] | English: | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDINE-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B PYRIDINE | [2007/46] | French: | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDIN-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUORBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B PYRIDINE | [2007/46] |
Former [2001/23] | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDIN-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUORBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO[ 3,4-B]PYRIDIN | ||
Former [2001/23] | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDINE-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUOROBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B]PYRIDINE | ||
Former [2001/23] | 3-(4-AMINO-5-ETHYLPYRIMIDIN-2-YL)-1-(2-FLUORBENZYL)-1H-PYRAZOLO 3,4-B]PYRIDINE | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9823619 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * claims 1,7-10 * * examples 16,20 * [A] 1,3 |