EP1158869 - Chelated food additive and method of preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/49] | CHELATED FEED ADDITIVE AND METHOD OF PREPARATION | ||
[2002/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agristudio S.R.L. Via Gramsci, 56 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Agristudio S.R.L. Via Gramsci 104/F 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRIBOLLA, Antonio Via Martiri della Bettola, 96 I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al C/o BUGNION SpA Via Borsellino 22 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2008/32] |
Former [2001/49] | Lanzoni, Luciano, et al c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Roma, 38 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 99936958.0 | 19.07.1999 | [2001/49] | WO1999IT00225 | Priority number, date | IT1999RE00028 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: IT RE990028 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053032 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1158869 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158869 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, C07C323/52, C07C319/20, A23K1/175 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C05D9/02 (EP,US);
A23K20/00 (US);
A23K20/142 (EP,US);
A23K20/24 (EP,US);
A23K20/30 (EP,US);
C05F11/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 23.04.2001 | LV | 23.04.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 23.04.2001 | SI | 23.04.2001 | Title | German: | Chelatierte Lebensmittelzusatz und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/05] | English: | Chelated food additive and method of preparation thereof | [2002/05] | French: | Additif alimentaire chelatisé et procédé de preparation | [2002/05] |
Former [2001/49] | CHELATIERTES FUTTERSMITTELSZUSATZES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | ||
Former [2001/49] | CHELATED FEED ADDITIVE AND METHOD OF PREPARATION | ||
Former [2001/49] | ADDITIF ALIMENTAIRE CHELAT ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.07.2003 | LU | 19.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | CY | 19.07.2003 | |
LU | 19.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 19.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [PX]JPH1175885 ; | [A]EP0049057 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 4-6 * page 3, lines 19-21 * * example 1 * * claim 6 *; | [XA]US4579962 (TAKANO MASAHARU [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, lines 25-29 * * column 2, lines 50-53 * * column 4, lines 5-7 * * example 8 * * claims 1,6,8 * * see above citations; column 3, lines 1-4 * [A] 4-6; | [A]WO9636598 (ZINPRO CORP [US]) [A] 4-6* page 9; example 5 * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11075885 A 19990323 (NIPPON SODA CO LTD) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * |