EP1147291 - COMPRESSOR ENDWALL BLEED SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/43] | COMPRESSOR ENDWALL BLEED SYSTEM | ||
[2007/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allison Advanced Development Company P.O. Box 7162 Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | [2007/34] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Allison Advanced Development Company P.O. Box 7162 Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESS, Robert, A., Jr. 218 W. Admiral Way Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
HANSEN, Jeffrey, L. 6423 Rockville Road Indianapolis, IN 46214 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937125.5 | 26.02.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999US04319 | Priority number, date | US19980076026P | 26.02.1998 Original published format: US 76026 P | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9951866 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1147291 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1147291 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01B25/00, F02K3/06, F04D29/68, F01D5/14 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
F02K3/075 (EP,US);
F01D5/022 (EP,US);
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F04D27/023 (EP,US);
F04D29/542 (EP,US);
F04D29/682 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/43] | F01B25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | ZAPFSYSTEM FÜR EINE KOMPRESSORWAND SOWIE BETRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2007/02] | English: | COMPRESSOR ENDWALL BLEED SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2007/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE PURGE DE PAROI D'EXTREMITE DE COMPRESSEUR ET PROCEDE D'OPERATION | [2007/02] |
Former [2001/43] | ZAPFSYSTEM FÜR EINE KOMPRESSORWAND | ||
Former [2001/43] | COMPRESSOR ENDWALL BLEED SYSTEM | ||
Former [2001/43] | SYSTEME DE PURGE DE PAROI D'EXTREMITE DE COMPRESSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.08.2007 | BE | 22.08.2007 | CH | 22.08.2007 | CY | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | LI | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | ES | 03.12.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | IE | 26.02.2008 | LU | 26.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
IE | 26.02.2008 | ||
LU | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
IE | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
IE | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3262635 (SMULAND ROBERT J) [A] 3,7,15,20 * figures 3-6 *; | [A]GB1197711 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-27* page 4, line 58 - line 102 *; | [A]US3632223 (HAMPTON THOMAS L) [A] 2,4,6,14,23 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US3735593 (HOWELL A) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * column 2, line 28 - line 31 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 25 *; | [Y]US5059093 (KHALID SYED J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-15,23-26 * column 4, line 18 - line 34 *; | [XY]US5327716 (GIFFIN III ROLLIN G [US], et al) [X] 22 * column 4, line 3 - line 14 * * figure 3 * [Y] 23-26; | [A]US5531565 (MEINDL THOMAS [CH], et al) [A] 22 * column 2, line 59 - line 64 * | International search | [A]US2192229 (JOHNSON FRED V, et al); | [A]US2520697 (MACLEISH SMITH DAVID); | [A]FR1012339 (HISPANO SUIZA SA); | [A]US2693904 (WINNETT BOYD); | [X]US2738921 (HAUSMANN GEORGE F); | [A]US2848156 (MORRIS OPPENHEIMER ROBERT); | [A]US2958456 (ROBERT FORSHAW JAMES); | [A]US3142438 (BATHGATE MCKENZIE ARCHIBALD); | [A]US3262635 (SMULAND ROBERT J); | [A]US3597106 (ANDERSON BERNARD JOSEPH); | [A]US3632223 (HAMPTON THOMAS L); | [A]US3945759 (BOBO MELVIN); | [Y]US3966355 (PIERPOLINE MARIO F); | [A]US4156344 (CUTHBERTSON ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]US4362465 (RIOLLET GILBERT, et al); | [A]US4419045 (ANDRE PIERRE A [FR], et al); | [A]US4969326 (BLESSING WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [X]US5531565 (MEINDL THOMAS [CH], et al) |