EP1096877 - Apparatus for non-invasively monitoring a subject's arterial blood pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/19] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING A SUBJECT'S ARTERIAL BLOOD PRESSURE | ||
[2004/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tensys Medical, Inc. Suite 100, 5825 Oberlin Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Tensys Medical, Inc. Suite 100, 5825 Oberlin Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOSS, Gregory, I. 405 Glenmont Drive Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
SOMERVILLE, Alvis, J. 9940 Cummins Place San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 03 /
FINBURGH, Simon, E. 12113 Branicole Lane San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Enskat, Michael Antony Frank Saunders & Dolleymore, 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937287.3 | 15.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999US16189 | Priority number, date | US19980120205 | 20.07.1998 Original published format: US 120205 | US19980120069 | 20.07.1998 Original published format: US 120069 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0003635 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096877 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096877 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | Gerät zur nichtinvasiven Überwachung des arteriellen Blutdrucks | [2004/50] | English: | Apparatus for non-invasively monitoring a subject's arterial blood pressure | [2004/50] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance non invasive de la pression sanguine arterielle d'un sujet | [2004/50] |
Former [2001/19] | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTBLUTIGEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON ARTERIELLEM BLUTDRUCK | ||
Former [2001/19] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR NON-INVASIVELY MONITORING A SUBJECT'S ARTERIAL BLOOD PRESSURE | ||
Former [2001/19] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE NON INVASIVE DE LA PRESSION SANGUINE ARTERIELLE D'UN SUJET | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | CH | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | FR | 08.06.2005 | IT | 08.06.2005 | LI | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | CY | 15.07.2005 | IE | 15.07.2005 | LU | 15.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GB | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | ES | 19.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | DE | 01.02.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.07.2005 | ||
FR | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
IT | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
LU | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 15.07.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
IE | 15.07.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5238000 (NIWA MINORU [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,10,11,13,15,18,19,23,24,30,31,34-38,40-43 * column 5, line 23 - column 13, line 17 *; | [X]US5273046 (BUTTERFIELD ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,20,23,24,26,28,30 * column 6, line 16 - column 11, line 42 * * column 15, line 47 - line 50 *; | [XA]EP0818176 (COLIN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-8,13,15,23,28,30 * column 6, line 13 - column 8, line 24 * [A] 2,19,32,34,39,40,44; | [AD]WO9825511 (VITALWAVE CORP [US]) [AD] 1,14,27* the whole document * | by applicant | US5848970 |