EP1099165 - FILE SYSTEM IMAGE TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Network Appliance, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Network Appliance, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Network Appliance, Inc. 2770 San Tomas Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HITZ, David 245 Old Spanish Trail Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | 02 /
KLEIMAN, Steven 157 El Monte Court Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Guy 46 Starlite Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
O'MALLEY, Sean 1230 South Mary Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937603.1 | 28.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999US17148 | Priority number, date | US19980127497 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: US 127497 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007104 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099165 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099165 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G06F11/1448 (EP,US);
G06F16/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/1435 (EP,US);
G06F11/1456 (EP,US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | DATEI-SYSTEM BILD-ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2001/20] | English: | FILE SYSTEM IMAGE TRANSFER | [2001/20] | French: | TRANSFERT D'IMAGES DANS UN SYSTEME DE FICHIERS | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | BE | 29.09.2004 | CH | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | LI | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0410630 (IBM [US]) [A] 43,44* page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 29 *; | [X]EP0566967 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-94 * column 5, line 57 - column 9, line 8 * |