EP1102532 - ANTIMICROBIAL TREATMENT OF ENCLOSED SYSTEMS HAVING CONTINUOUS OR INTERMITTENT FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROBAN PRODUCTS COMPANY 11400 Vanstory Drive Huntersville, NC 28078 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states MICROBAN PRODUCTS COMPANY Suite 110, 11515 Vanstory Drive Huntersville, NC 28078 / US | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states MICROBAN PRODUCTS COMPANY Suite 110, 11515 Vanstory Drive Huntersville, NC 28078 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATIL, Arvind, S. 1030 Southwent Drive Davidson, NC 28036 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Chung, Hsu Min, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Chung, Hsu Min, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2001/22] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99937666.8 | 29.07.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999US17313 | Priority number, date | US19980094532P | 29.07.1998 Original published format: US 94532 P | US19990362619 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: US 362619 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005949 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102532 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102532 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/08 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N31/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/16, A01N25/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE BEHANDLUNG VON GESCHLOSSENEN SYSTEMEN MIT KONINUIERLICHEM ODER STOSSWEISEM FLÜSSIGKEITSSTROM | [2001/22] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL TREATMENT OF ENCLOSED SYSTEMS HAVING CONTINUOUS OR INTERMITTENT FLUID FLOW | [2001/22] | French: | TRAITEMENT ANTIMICROBIEN DE SYSTEMES DE FLUIDES EN CIRCUIT FERME A ECOULEMENT CONTINU OU INTERMITTENT | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2008 | 14.01.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | BE | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | PT | 10.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3923991 (SLOAN VALVE CO [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9622114 (VITAPHORE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 4, paragraph 1 ** page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 9; example - * | International search | [Y]FR2322801 (MARR EDMOND [FR]); | [Y]GB2168254 (BARD INC C R); | [Y]WO8605391 (GLUCK BRUNO A [AU]) |