EP1103116 - METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR MONITORING DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS USING DIAGNOSTIC INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS USING DIAGNOSTIC INFORMATION | ||
[2005/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firstsense Software, Inc. 21 B Street Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, James 35 South Street Needham, MA 02492 / US | 02 /
AGARWAL, Neeraj 88 Hawk Drive Bedford, NH 03110 / US | 03 /
FERNANDEZ, Gary 358 Laws Brook Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 04 /
DOCTOR, Murtaza 1 Fernflight Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | 05 /
KANE, Ken 25 Overlook Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 06 /
BRINER, Albert 64 Twiss Lane Hollis, NH 03049 / US | 07 /
MUDDANA, Sehkar 5708 Staerns Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 08 /
DEGROOT, Pieter P.O. Box 306 Dunstale, MA 01827 / US | 09 /
LYON-SMITH, John 10 Kayla Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | 10 /
MENDEL, Scott 84 Constance Drive Lowell, MA 01854 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Potter, Vanessa J., et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937753.4 | 03.08.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999US17531 | Priority number, date | US19980095142P | 03.08.1998 Original published format: US 95142 P | US19990137121P | 02.06.1999 Original published format: US 137121 P | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008806 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103116 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103116 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L29/06 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
H04L43/00 (EP);
H04L43/0852 (EP,KR);
G06F11/3006 (KR);
G06F11/3024 (KR);
H04L43/10 (EP,KR);
H04L43/12 (EP,KR);
H04L43/16 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | 21.02.2001 | LT | 21.02.2001 | LV | 21.02.2001 | MK | 21.02.2001 | RO | 21.02.2001 | SI | 21.02.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VERTEILTER ANWENDUNGEN MIT DIAGNOSEINFORMATIONEN | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD AND PROGRAM FOR MONITORING DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS USING DIAGNOSTIC INFORMATION | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPLICATIONS REPARTIES, A L'AIDE D'INFORMATIONS DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2005/01] |
Former [2001/22] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VERTEILTER ANWENDUNGEN MIT DIAGNOSEINFORMATIONEN | ||
Former [2001/22] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS USING DIAGNOSTIC INFORMATION | ||
Former [2001/22] | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPLICATIONS REPARTIES, A L'AIDE D'INFORMATIONS DE DIAGNOSTIC | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 23.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | FR | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | LU | 03.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | DE | 02.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
LU | 03.08.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
LU | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
LU | 03.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5101402 (CHIU DAH-MING [US], et al) [A] 1,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 62 * * figure 16 *; | [A]US5430709 (GALLOWAY JAMES R [DE]) [A] 1,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 22 ** column 4, line 16 - column 6, line 40 *; | [A]US5648966 (KONDO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,23 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, lines 19-32 *; | [A] - VASSILA A ET AL, "INTRODUCING ACTIVE MANAGED OBJECTS FOR EFFECTIVE AND AUTONOMOUS DISTRIBUTED MANAGEMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENCE IN BROADBAND SERVICES AND NETWORKS,DE,BERLIN, SPRINGER, vol. CONF. 3, ISBN 3-540-60479-0, page 415-429, XP000593492 [A] 1,23 * abstract * * page 417, line 12 - page 421, line 18 * * figure 2 * |