EP0980211 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING BRINE FROM COEXTRUDED SAUSAGE STRANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOWNSEND ENGINEERING COMPANY 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBUSSEN, Jaap 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 02 /
KOBUSSEN, Mart 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 03 /
KOBUSSEN, Jos 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | 04 /
BASILE, Vincent, Louis, III 2425 Hubbell Avenue Des Moines, IA 50317 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937851.6 | 01.03.1999 | [2000/08] | WO1999US04452 | Priority number, date | US19980036596 | 06.03.1998 Original published format: US 36596 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944430 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980211 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980211 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
A22C13/0016 (EP,US);
A22C2013/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SOLE AUS COEXTRUDIERTEN WURSTFASERN | [2000/08] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOVING BRINE FROM COEXTRUDED SAUSAGE STRANDS | [2000/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ELIMINER LA SAUMURE DE CORDONS DE SAUCISSES COEXTRUDES | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2003 | CH | 12.11.2003 | CY | 12.11.2003 | FI | 12.11.2003 | LI | 12.11.2003 | GR | 12.02.2004 | SE | 12.02.2004 | IE | 01.03.2004 | LU | 01.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | PT | 12.04.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
IE | 01.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
IE | 01.03.2004 | ||
LU | 01.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
LU | 01.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 12.11.2003 | |
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 12.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3622353 (BRADSHAW NOEL JAMES, et al) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 67 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 17; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US3917862 (BRIDGEFORD DOUGLAS J) [A] 1* claims 1-7 *; | [A]GB2264624 (TEE PAK INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 7; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0619077 (STORK PROTECON LANGEN BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 20; claims 1-30 * | by applicant | US3622353 |