EP1144799 - PIPE HANDLING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
For all designated states B.J. Services International B.V. Vasco da Gamastraat 27 7825 VJ Emmen / NL | |||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Well Engineering Partners B.V. Tynaarlosestraat 68 9481 AE Vries / NL | ||
For all designated states B.J. Services International B.V. Vasco da Gamastraat 27 7825 VJ Emmen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSTER, Egbert Groenkampen 68 NL-9407 RG Assen / NL | 02 /
KOCH, Kasper Wilhelminalaan 44 NL-2625 KH Delft / NL | 03 /
VAN ONNA, Martinus, Bernardus, Stefanus Oostdijk 46 NL-4675 RE St. Philipsland / NL | 04 /
ALTMANN, Klaus Röntgenstrasse 9 D-48465 Schüttdorf / DE | 05 /
BAKKER, Thomas, Walburgis Tynaarlosestraat 68 NL-9481 AE Vries / NL | 06 /
PLATJE, Berend Harm Breedenborg 2 NL-9502 VT Stadskanaal / NL | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/36] |
Former [2002/27] | Boon-Dijkhuis, Anouk Hélène J., et al Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/42] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99938040.5 | 11.06.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999NL00366 | Priority number, date | NL19991011069 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: NL 1011069 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043631 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144799 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144799 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/22, E21B19/20 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
E21B19/20 (EP,US);
E21B19/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2003/40] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON BOHRLOCHGESTäNGEN | [2001/42] | English: | PIPE HANDLING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2001/42] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION D'UN TUBE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3667554 (SMITHERMAN EUGENE A) [A] 1,17-19 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3677345 (SIZER PHILLIP S) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,17,19-21,26,27 * column 1, lines 41-48 * * column 2, lines 34-55 * [Y] 7,8,15,16,28,29; | [A]US3724567 (SMITHERMAN E) [A] 1,17-19 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1405359 (INST ELEKTROSWARKI PATONA, et al) [A] 15,16,28,29 * claim 1 ** figure 2 *; | [A]US4848455 (FENYVESI JANOS [HU]) [A] 1,17-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0396204 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 15,16,28,29 * claims 1,2,4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5013880 (PUETTMANN FRANZ-JOSEF [DE]) [A] 15,16,28,29 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5823267 (BURGE PHILIP [GB], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 3, lines 53-60 * |