Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1092080
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.12.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
13.12.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
13.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
02.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
23.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|