Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU750116B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2002 | B2 | AU5279999 | 24.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1092080 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2003 | B1 | EP1092080 | 18.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP99938209 | 24.06.1999 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2336353 | 28.10.2008 | C | CA2336353 | 13.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69905164T | 02.10.2003 | T2 | DE69905164D1 | 06.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1092080T | 22.04.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA002458 | 25.04.2002 | B1 | EA200100092 | 25.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20006695L | 28.02.2001 | L | NO20006695D0 | 29.12.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | EP9904409 | 24.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0001926 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1119501C | 27.08.2003 | C | CN1308705 | 15.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GC0000018 | 30.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JO2101B1 | 21.05.2000 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA25282 | 31.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY117694 | 31.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6176313 | 23.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP98305212 | 01.07.1998 |