EP1092080 - METHOD AND TOOL FOR FRACTURING AN UNDERGROUND FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COENEN, Josef, Guillaume, Christoffel Volmerlaan 6 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | 02 /
KENTER, Cornelis, Jan Volmerlaan 6 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | 03 /
ZIJSLING, Djurre, Hans Volmerlaan 6 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | [2001/16] | Application number, filing date | 99938209.6 | 24.06.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999EP04409 | Priority number, date | EP19980305212 | 01.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98305212 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001926 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092080 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092080 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/26, E21B43/267 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
E21B43/267 (EP,US);
E21B21/002 (EP,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, NL [2001/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND WERKZEUG ZUR SPALTENBILDUNG IN EINER UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATION | [2001/16] | English: | METHOD AND TOOL FOR FRACTURING AN UNDERGROUND FORMATION | [2001/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET OUTIL POUR FRACTURER UNE FORMATION SOUTERRAINE | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2687179 (DISMUKES NEWTON B) [AD] 1,10 * column 1, line 7 - line 23 * * column 3, line 8 - line 17 * * column 5, line 33 - line 41 *; | [AD]US3062294 (HUITT JIMMIE L, et al) [AD] 1,10 * column 5, line 54 - line 61 * * claim 1 *; | [A]FR1602480 (INSTITUT FRANÇAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5224556 (WILSON DENNIS R [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 11, line 60 - line 66 * * column 12, line 1 - line 4 *; | [A]US5226749 (PERKINS THOMAS K [US]) [A] 1,10 * column A *; | [A]US5355802 (PETITJEAN LUC [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 4 - line 8 *; | [AD]US5511615 (RHETT DOUGLAS W [US]) [AD] 1,10 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 27 - line 31 *; | [A]US5576485 (SERATA SHOSEI [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 11 - line 36 *; | [A]US5675088 (SERATA SHOSEI [US]) [A] 1,10 * column A * * column 8, line 56 - line 62 *; | [AD] - NISHIDA, "static rock breaker using TiNi shape memory alloy"", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, (1990), vol. 56-58, page 711-716, XP000852882 [AD] 1,10 * the whole document * |