01.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
11.06.2010 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
05.06.2010 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
14.05.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
25.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
13.03.2010 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
08.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
04.09.2009 |
Opposition withdrawn |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
25.04.2009 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
14.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
14.01.2009 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
09.09.2008 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
15.08.2008 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
11.04.2008 |
Change - name/address |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
05.10.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.10.2001 |
First examination report |
|
24.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
30.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
07.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|