EP1098872 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL OXIME-ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PREISS, Thomas Waltharistrasse 5 D-67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
HENKELMANN, Jochem Bassermannstrasse 25 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
TROFIMOV, Boris Lermontov Street 321-a/32 Irkutsk, 664033 / RU | 04 /
MIKHALEVA, Albina Lermontov Street 289/17 Irkutsk, 664033 / RU | 05 /
VASILTSOV, Alexander, M. Lermontov Street 313-B/11 Irkutsk, 664033 / RU | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99938330.0 | 23.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP05292 | Priority number, date | DE19981034654 | 31.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834654 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007983 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098872 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098872 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C249/12, C07C251/34 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
C07C251/38 (EP,US);
C07C251/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON VINYLOXIMETHERN | [2001/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL OXIME-ETHERS | [2001/20] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE VINYLOXIMETHERS | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2003 | FI | 19.11.2003 | IE | 19.11.2003 | DK | 19.02.2004 | GR | 19.02.2004 | SE | 19.02.2004 | PT | 19.04.2004 | AT | 23.07.2004 | LU | 23.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 19.11.2003 | |
FI | 19.11.2003 | ||
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
AT | 23.07.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
AT | 23.07.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
DK | 19.02.2004 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
IE | 19.11.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
GR | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 19.11.2003 | |
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 19.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU1095593 ; | [A]EP0714886 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * examples 1-3; claim 5 *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950410), vol. 122, no. 15, Database accession no. 186603, page 966, column 2, XP002123440 [A] 1 * abstract * | [D] - O.A. TARASOVA ET AL, ZH. ORG. KHIM., (1994), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 810 - 815 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19741125), vol. 81, no. 21, Database accession no. 135371, page 367, column 1, XP002123441 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - V.P. PIVNENKO, ZH. PRIKL. KHIM., Leningrad, (1974), vol. 47, no. 8, pages 1892 - 1893 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 37, Database accession no. 94-300713, XP002123442 & SU1095593 A 19940330 (AS SIBE IRKUT ORGANIC CHEM) [A] 1 * abstract * |