EP1100762 - ERYTHROMYCIN DERIVATIVES WITH ANTIBIOTIC ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLACINI, Franco Via G. Balla, 14 I-20151 Milan / IT | 02 /
BOTTA, Daniela Via Valleggio, 4 I-22100 Como / IT | 03 /
ALBINI, Enrico Via Torchietto, 14 I-27100 Pavia / IT | 04 /
UNGHERI, Domenico Via della Repubblica, 92 I-20015 Parabiago / IT | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/21] | Marchi, Massimo, et al c/o Marchi & Partners s.r.l., Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99938386.2 | 27.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999EP05485 | Priority number, date | IT1998MI01776 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: IT MI981776 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0006606 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100762 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100762 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 13.02.2001 | Title | German: | ERYTHROMYCIN-DERIVATE MIT ANTIBIOTISCHER WIRKUNG | [2001/21] | English: | ERYTHROMYCIN DERIVATIVES WITH ANTIBIOTIC ACTIVITY | [2001/21] | French: | DERIVES D'ERYTHROMYCINE AYANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTIBIOTIQUE | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FI | 10.03.2004 | IT | 10.03.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | IE | 27.07.2004 | LU | 27.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
IE | 27.07.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
IE | 27.07.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
FI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 10.03.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9618633 (ZAMBON SPA [IT], et al) [DA] 1,7,8* the whole document *; | [A] - GASC J C ET AL, "New ether oxime derivatives erythromycin A: a structure-activity relationship study", J. ANTIBIOT. (JANTAJ,00218820);1991; VOL.44 (3); PP.313-30, Cent. Rech. Roussel Uclaf;Romainville; 93230; Fr. (FR), XP000567789 [A] 1,7,8 * page 315, table 2, compound 8 page 316, table 3, compounds 15,18,19,33 page 317, table 4, compounds 45,48,54 * |