Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1100807
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.04.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
30.12.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.09.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.12.2002 |
First examination report |
|
04.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.06.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.04.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
06.04.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
05.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|