EP1100807 - STEREOISOMERS OF CpG OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Iowa City, IA 52242 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Iowa City, IA 52242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIEG, Arthur, M. 890 Park Place Iowa City, IA 52246 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99938843.2 | 27.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US17100 | Priority number, date | US19980094370P | 27.07.1998 Original published format: US 94370 P | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006588 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100807 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, A61K31/70, C12N15/11 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/117 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEREOISOMERE VON CPG OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN UND VERWANDTE VERFAHREN | [2001/21] | English: | STEREOISOMERS OF CpG OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND RELATED METHODS | [2001/21] | French: | STEREO-ISOMERES D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES DE TYPE CpG ET PROCEDES CONNEXES | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 25.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9639154 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,29,31,60,62,64,74,76 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9619572 (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al) [X] 60,64,74 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9602555 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]); | [A]WO9818810 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US], et al) |