EP1100682 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPENSATING FOR SKEW IN AN INK JET PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKREN, Benjamin, Alan 297 Taylor Drive Lexington, KY 40511 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co,. European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2001/21] | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Frank B. Dehn & Co,. European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99938923.2 | 29.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US17402 | Priority number, date | US19980124104 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: US 124104 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0006386 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100682 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100682 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/505, B41J19/14 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
B41J2/04505 (EP,US);
B41J2/04586 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | B41J2/01, B41J29/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/50] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KOMPENSATION EINER SCHRÄGLAGE IN EINEM TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER | [2001/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR COMPENSATING FOR SKEW IN AN INK JET PRINTER | [2001/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE COMPENSER LE DESALIGNEMENT D'UNE IMPRIMANTE A JET D'ENCRE | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0257570 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,15* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0674993 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,8,15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5539434 (FUSE TAKESHI [JP]); | [XE]US5956055 (GIBSON BRUCE DAVID [US], et al) |