EP1105731 - PROFILING AND CATALOGING EXPRESSED PROTEIN TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zycos Inc. 763 East Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHICZ, Roman, M. 4 Cottage Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
HEDLEY, Mary, Lynne 51 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
HSU, Charles Apartment C, 2106 Scott Street San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | 04 /
URBAN, Robert, G. 51 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
CHICZ, Roman, M. 4 Cottage Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | ||
02 /
HEDLEY, Mary, Lynne 51 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
03 /
HSU, Charles Apartment C, 2106 Scott Street San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | |||
04 /
URBAN, Robert, G. 51 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2001/24] | White, Martin Paul, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99938998.4 | 04.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999US17680 | Priority number, date | US19980133094 | 12.08.1998 Original published format: US 133094 | US19980096291P | 12.08.1998 Original published format: US 96291 P | US19990135728P | 25.05.1999 Original published format: US 135728 P | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0009654 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1105731 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105731 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G06F17/30 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP);
C07K14/70539 (EP);
G01N33/56977 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DARSTELLUNG DES PROFILS UND KATALOGISIERUNG VON EXPRIMIERTEN PROTEINMARKERN | [2001/24] | English: | PROFILING AND CATALOGING EXPRESSED PROTEIN TAGS | [2001/24] | French: | ETABLISSEMENT DE PROFIL ET CATALOGAGE DE MARQUEURS DE PROTEINES EXPRIMEES | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | BE | 18.10.2006 | CH | 18.10.2006 | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | IT | 18.10.2006 | LI | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | ES | 29.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/06] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
CY | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IT | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
CH | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
LI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
ES | 29.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | NL | 18.10.2006 | |
ES | 29.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - KASSENBROCK & R B KELLY C K, "Interaction of heavy chain binding protein (BiP/GRP78) with adenine nucleotides", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1989), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1461 - 1467, XP002130142 [XD] 10-14 * the whole document * | [A] - PETROVECKI MLADEN ET AL, "Analysis of data on leukocyte surface markers for recognition of leukemia/lymphoma phenotype pattern.", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9120, pages 21 - 25, XP002205434 [A] 10-15,17-20,22,23,25,35-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-9120(95)02019-5 | [A] - CELIS J E ET AL., "The human keratinocyte two-dimensional gel protein database (update 1995): Mapping components of signal transduction pathways.", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1995), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 2177 - 2240, XP001095051 [A] 10-15,17-20,22,23,25,35-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.11501601355 | International search | [A]US5692181 (ANAND TEJWANSH S [US], et al); | [A]US5741653 (KAUVAR LAWRENCE M [US], et al); | [A]US5778363 (LIGHT JOHN [US]) |