EP1104300 - CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND ISOSTERES OF HETEROCYCLIC RING COMPOUNDS HAVING MULTIPLE HETEROATOMS FOR VISION AND MEMORY DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GPI NIL Holdings, Inc. 222 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, Douglas, T. 316 South Main Street North Wales, PA 19454 / US | 02 /
SAUER, Hansjorg 10617 Lorain Avenue Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | 03 /
HAMILTON, Gregory, S. 6501 Frederick Road Catonsville, MD 21228 / US | 04 /
STEINER, Joseph, P. 3179 Jupiter Island Court Mt. Airy, MD 21771 / US | [2001/38] |
Former [2001/23] | 01 /
ROSS, Douglas, T. 316 South Main Street North Wales, PA 19454 / US | ||
02 /
SAUER, Hansjorg 10617 Lorain Avenue Silver Spring, MD 20901 / US | |||
03 /
HAMILTON, Gregory, S. 6501 Frederick Road Catonsville, MD 21228 / US | |||
04 /
STEINER, Joseph, P. 4150 Louisville Road Finksburg, MD 21048 / US | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99939731.8 | 12.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999US18238 | Priority number, date | US19980134476 | 14.08.1998 Original published format: US 134476 | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0009106 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104300 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/41, A61K31/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/42, A61K31/415, C07D263/04, C07D207/16, A61P27/02 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/23] | Extension states | AL | 29.12.2000 | LT | 29.12.2000 | LV | 29.12.2000 | MK | 29.12.2000 | RO | 29.12.2000 | SI | 29.12.2000 | Title | German: | CARBONSÄURE UND ISOSTERE VON HETEROZYCLISCHEN RINGVERBINDUNGEN MIT MEHREREN HETEROATOMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SICHT- UND GEDÄCHNISSSCHWÄCHEN | [2001/23] | English: | CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND ISOSTERES OF HETEROCYCLIC RING COMPOUNDS HAVING MULTIPLE HETEROATOMS FOR VISION AND MEMORY DISORDERS | [2001/23] | French: | ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES ET ISOSTERES DE COMPOSES A NOYAU HETEROCYCLIQUE POSSEDANT PLUSIEURS HETEROATOMES ET DESTINES A DES TROUBLES DE LA VISION ET DE LA MEMOIRE | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 26.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0044134 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [X] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * abstract *; | [X]GB2155331 (FLORIDA UNIVERSITY OF) [X] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]EP0444546 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * abstract * * page 2, lines 36-58 * * page 5, lines 6-40 *; | [X]WO9513811 (BYK NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,12-17 * abstract *; | [X]WO9640633 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 31, line 24 - page 32, line 9; examples 1-15 *; | [X]WO9727180 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * abstract * * page 117, lines 3-15; examples 13,20,21,27,40,106,107,109-111; claims 1,18,19 *; | [X]WO9813355 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10-19,21,22 * abstract * * page 15, line 1 - page 21, line 26 * * page 25, line 23 - page 26, line 11; examples 1,2; claims 1-35 *; | [X]WO9813343 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11-19 * page 12, line 9 - page 14, line 4 * * page 22, line 14 - page 27, line 8 * * page 31, lines 3-17 *; | [X]WO9829117 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 18, line 12 - page 24, line 7 * * page 50, lines 3-17 *; | [XP]WO9855090 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [XP] 12-19,21,22 * abstract * * page 12, line 23 - page 15, line 12 * * page 24, line 19 - page 26, line 13; table II * * page 26, line 25 - page 28, line 20; table III * * page 29, line 1 - page 34, line 17; table IV * * page 35, line 1 - page 36, line 23; table V * * page 37, line 15 - page 38, line 23 * * page 42, line 10 - page 51, line 18 * * page 53, line 1 - page 68, line 13 * * page 74, line 35 - page 89, line 26 * * page 96, lines 10-25; examples 4,5; claims 3,4 *; | [PX]WO9906390 (ATHENA NEUROSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * page 4, lines 13-26; tables IA,IB * * page 161, line 26 - page 162, line 5 * * page 165, lines 10-23 * * examples 11-17,25,26,29-31,36,49,51,52,54,55,59-61,64; claims 71,73,76,78,79,84,85,88,90-92,95,109,111; table II * * examples 147,161,164,167-176,181,185-191,195-198,201-222 * * examples 225,228-239,242,249-253,255,257-264,266 * * examples 267,270-273,275,279,283-287,289-292,299,300; table IIIA * * examples 334,335; claims 1-34 *; | [PX]WO9914998 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [PX] 12-22 * page 188, line 5 - page 200, line 8; examples 4,5,23; table XLIV * * page 283 - page 284; claims 1-177 *; | [PX]EP0930067 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [PX] 1-7,10,12-19,21 * claims 1,4 *; | [E]WO9962888 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-22 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - page 10, line 9 * * compounds 1-220; page 24, line 35 - page 25, line 14; example 1; claims 1-13,65-71 *; | [E]WO9962487 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [E] 12-19,21,22 * abstract *; | [E]WO0004005 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [E] 12-19 * page 108; tables 1-40 * * pages 124-132 * * page 144 * * page 146 * * pages 148-150 ** claims 1-15 * |